BURNHAM GRAMMAR SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The fund operates for the advancement of the education of pupils at Burnham Grammar School by providing funds, items, services and facilities that it is not the obligation of any statutory authority to provide. Typical activities include a wide range of school trips, extra-curricular activities and activity days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 07 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANDREW JAMES GILLESPIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Gordon-Smith | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dylan Featherstone | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Trehy | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bainbridge | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CRAIG BURROWS | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CATHCART | Trustee | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHIRLEY FOSTER | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FRITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.31k | £6.96k | £25.47k | £6.27k | £1.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.04k | £1.00k | £11.31k | £169.14k | £3.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT BURNHAM GRAMMAR SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FUNDS, ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES THAT IT IS NOT THE OBLIGATION OF ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY TO PROVIDE. 2. THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE - BURNHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burnham Grammar School
Hogfair Lane Lan
Burnham
SLOUGH
SL1 7HG
- Phone:
- 01628 604812
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window