Financial history ART START

Charity number: 1096634
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £122.51k £103.26k £97.89k £84.40k £76.24k
Total expenditure £113.74k £109.14k £97.65k £96.81k £69.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £20.00k £0