Financial history THE ELYSIAN SINGERS OF LONDON

Charity number: 1095739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.36k £1.04k £23.95k £18.56k £21.45k
Total expenditure £8.31k £1.03k £20.23k £22.92k £22.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A