Financial history MEWE

Charity number: 1098787
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2006 31/10/2007 31/10/2008 31/10/2009 31/10/2010
Total gross income £69.73k £56.59k £45.50k £32.86k £17.26k
Total expenditure £69.67k £72.93k £36.51k £31.64k £18.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A