BEULAH BRASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beulah Brass enables musicians to meet and play brass band music. It provides musical instruments, uniforms and rehearsal facilities. Members meet weekly for practice. The band supports local fund raising by playing at charity events at low cost. The band also plays at church services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 17 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID WOODWARD | Chair | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Richard Paul Bysouth | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mitchell Harold Alix Bradley-Williams | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|||||
DR DAVID IAN GOZZARD | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET KENT | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD ANTHONY STEELE THORNTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.66k | £2.62k | £866 | £1.91k | £3.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.07k | £2.17k | £1.24k | £1.92k | £2.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 NOV 2002 AS AMENDED ON 30 JUL 2003 AS AMENDED ON 12 NOV 2008 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2010 AS AMENDED ON 25 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF BRASS BAND MUSIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE COUNTY OF CONWY, ISLE OF ANGLESEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Princes Drive
Colwyn Bay
Conwy
LL29 8PW
- Phone:
- 07884327226
- Email:
- info@beulahbrass.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window