Financial history COMMUNITY LIFE TRUST

Charity number: 1095763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £358.81k £754.23k £404.32k £589.50k £1.19m
Total expenditure £324.28k £413.14k £366.49k £579.08k £833.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants £10.10k £31.38k £47.08k £43.96k £40.52k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £749.57k N/A £576.58k £1.03m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £150.50k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £1.75k N/A £9.56k £9.01k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.90k N/A £3.36k £2.20k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £413.14k N/A £579.08k £833.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.88k N/A £1.94k £8.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £12.88k N/A £10.18k £27.28k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0