SS ROBIN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration, preservation and display of the 'SS Robin' steamship built in 1890 as a publically accessible London based maritime museum . Developing links with partner organisations, local schools and colleges for education and exhibition programmes. Fundraising, including major grant applications to Heritage Lottery Fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newham
Governance
- 07 February 2003: Standard registration
- SS ROBIN TRUST (Working name)
- SS ROBIN GALLERY LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Mann | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Robert Barnard | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Antony Bowring | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Kevin Whittle | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
ERIC GEORGE REYNOLDS | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
David Patrick Green | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
PAUL MARTIN BRICKELL | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.26k | £1.30k | £10.30k | £210.90k | £317.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.38k | £4.30k | £7.22k | £20.42k | £50.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 September 2021 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 12 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 FEBRUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF THE SS ROBIN AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION BY THE DISPLAY OF PHOTOGRAPHIC EXHIBITIONS IN THE SHIP.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON - TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SS Robin Trust c/o Urban Space Management Ltd
Trinity Buoy Wharf
64 Orchard Place
LONDON
E14 0JW
- Phone:
- 02075384198
- Email:
- info@ssrobin.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window