Financial history HESSLE SPORTING CLUB

Charity number: 1095799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £70.26k £33.89k £73.39k £46.42k £43.79k
Total expenditure £44.96k £25.18k £66.77k £58.66k £50.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A N/A N/A £29.00k