THE MICHAEL COHEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was formed by Sir Ronald Cohen, in memory of his father Michael Cohen. Its purpose is 'The support of Education at Exeter College (University of Oxford)'. The charity is relatively new and has been growing its capital base. However the Trustees have now agreed a formal grant distribution plan and grants are now being made on an annual basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR RONALD COHEN | Chair |
|
||||||||
Dr Andrew Roe | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Barnaby Taylor | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|||||||
MARK HOUGHTON-BERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.68k | £14.70k | £60.26k | £186.04k | £82.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £392.40k | £362.48k | £404.13k | £363.26k | £405.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 MARCH 2001 as amended on 08 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AT EXETER COLLEGE, OXFORD.
Area of benefit
EXETER COLLEGE, OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
EXETER COLLEGE
TURL STREET
OXFORD
OX1 3DP
- Phone:
- 01865279652
- Email:
- accounts@exeter.ox.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window