UMOYA CREATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through music, we bring reconciliation and development to regions where people suffer deprivation. We help young people discover their creative potential and use it to empower and advance themselves and their communities, promote equitable cultural exchange, build tolerance, fight poverty, restore confidence amongst the disenfranchised and heighten self-determination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Bristol City
- Liverpool City
- Suffolk
- Throughout London
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- South Africa
Governance
- 24 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Wayne Rumble | Chair | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
AZRA KAYANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 10 October 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 07 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS FORMED ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE APPRECIATION AND/OR PERFORMANCE OF THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BOTH NATIONALLY AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 IVELEY ROAD
LONDON
SW4 0EN
- Phone:
- 02076221570
- Email:
- info@umoyacreations.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window