ALDWORTH PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
APO is an Orchestra performing three concerts a year plus informal chamber music. Known for its innovative scheme such as the Concert Virgin scheme where by people who have not been to a live classical concert before can come for free. APO initiates education programmes to help children learn about classical music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 19 August 2004: Standard registration
- APO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Rowley | Chair | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Joan Hopkin | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jean Le Breuilly | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Aoife Sian Dudley | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Taylor | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.19k | £3.82k | £8.16k | £15.13k | £12.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.25k | £4.85k | £12.45k | £14.30k | £16.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES IN AND AROUND BERKSHIRE; 2. TO ACHIEVE AS HIGH A STANDARD AS POSSIBLE IN THE PERFORMANCE OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC, CORE ORCHESTRAL REPERTOIRE BEING PERFORMED FOR THE MOST PART, BUT ORCHESTRA WILL ALSO CHAMPION NEW MUSIC, PARTICULARLY THAT OF YOUNG COMPOSERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Ashford Gardens
Whitnash
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
CV31 2NB
- Phone:
- 07919404289
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window