Financial history BARCLAYS STOCKBROKERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1093833
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/07/2015 19/07/2016 19/07/2017 19/07/2018 19/07/2019
Total gross income £439.21k £6.05k £3.31k £5.32k £2.27k
Total expenditure £110.54k £17.14k £23.56k £56.50k £36.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A