HANDSWORTH WOOD U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
an educational/interests based club for people over the age of 50 who are not in full time employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 23 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Elizabeth Andrews | Chair | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Seadon | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Pamela Rogers | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS H FLINN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.95k | £1.92k | £2.50k | £4.00k | £4.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.60k | £1.04k | £1.05k | £2.80k | £5.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 30 October 2023 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 20 January 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 9 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN HANDSWORTH WOOD AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. (II) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
HANDSWORTH WOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 33
Cottesmore House
Browns Green
Handsworth
BIRMINGHAM
B20 1DW
- Phone:
- 01215239990
- Email:
- janice.1@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window