SHEEP MUSIC LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A&M Extract:- To encourage and develop knowledge, enjoyment and understanding of the arts including but not limited to music, dance, drama, film, storytelling, musical theatre, literature, poetry, visual art and craft To promote and advance the training and education of young people particularly but not exclusively in the Border counties of Powys, Herefordshire and Shropshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 26 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HYMAS | Chair | 11 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Ashby | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Curtis Ross | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Ramsay | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helena Rosemary Ramsay | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Owen Sinclair Rimmington | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA ANN LEOPOLD | Trustee | 11 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.78k | £6.31k | £107 | £14.10k | £20.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.78k | £10.43k | £1.69k | £12.79k | £14.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £37.50k | N/A | N/A | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 AUGUST 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF OTHER CULTURES, PARTICULARLY THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DANCE, FILM, STORYTELLING, MUSICAL THEATRE, LITERATURE, POETRY AND VISUAL ART AND CRAFT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN POWYS, HEREFORDSHIRE AND SHROPSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Inform Accounting Ltd
65 Mere Green Road
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B75 5BY
- Phone:
- 07920080623
- Email:
- info@sheep-music.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window