NEWTON REGIS VILLAGE HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects are to provide a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Newton Regis without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 05 August 2003: Standard registration
- 29 October 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 October 2014: Funds transferred to 1157625 NEWTON REGIS VILLAGE HALL CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2009 | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.12k | £25.29k | £26.12k | £32.93k | £24.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.05k | £21.58k | £22.90k | £27.94k | £26.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | 06 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | 17 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | 17 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | 18 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | 18 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED 15 JULY 2003 AND 12TH NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NEWTON REGIS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NEWTON REGIS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window