THE PITMAN FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Promote any purposes which are charitable in accordance with the laws of England and Wales and in particular (but without prejudice to the foregoing) to advance education for the public benefit and to promote other charitable purposes beneficial to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 April 2003: Standard registration
- 13 December 2022: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.51k | £5.06k | £4.88k | £3.96k | £3.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.81k | £21.30k | £2.35k | £8.10k | £399.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 05 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 30 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO PROMOTE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window