KINGSWAY EDUCATION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 October 2002: Standard registration
- 09 February 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KINGSWAY NURSERY (Working name)
- KINGSWAY SCHOOL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT KINGSWAY SCHOOL AND KINGSWAY NURSERY BY THE OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL AND NURSERY
Area of benefit
KINGSWAY SCHOOL AND KINGSWAY NURSERY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window