GREEN LIFE UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is working towards making an effective positive output in the ethnic minority community particularly but not exclusively for the Bengali Community living in the Newham and Tower Hamlets in the UK. We are also working for Alzheimer affected people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 24 June 2003: Standard registration
- 29 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BANGLA-AID UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £4.42k | £12.09k | £4.07k | £3.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.18k | £2.53k | £6.98k | £9.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 12 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 01 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 11 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 19 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/2014
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: (I) THE PROVISION OF CHARITABLE SERVICES TO MEMBERS OF THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM AND TOWER HAMLETS, IN PARTICULAR: (II) ADVANCING COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AND CITIZENSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND COUNSELLING. (III) PROMOTING GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVING SICKNESS. (IV) PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (V) RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED THAT ARISE AS A RESULT OF THEIR AGE OR DISABILITY. (VI) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH IN BANGLADESH BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM AND TOWER HAMLETS & BANGLADESH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window