HEREFORDSHIRE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS SUPPORT SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To build the capacity of third sector organisations and provide them with support, information and services including: - Advancement of community health and social care and activities for young people aged 8 to 25. Activities include volunteering services, capacity building, training, networking events and information, interest groups, policy research, Community Wheels and representational work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £127,004 from 3 government contract(s) and £94,883 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Herefordshire
Governance
- HEREFORDSHIRE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- HEREFORDSHIRE VOLUNTARY ACTION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNDA WILCOX | Chair |
|
|
|||||
dr Jonathan David Argent | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Tristram | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Penny | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Judith Faux | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CONSTANCE ROBINSON | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STEPHEN KELLY | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £628.93k | £477.07k | £590.63k | £933.56k | £411.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £661.87k | £466.33k | £591.05k | £970.33k | £439.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £62.67k | £110.93k | £126.11k | £127.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £146.58k | £158.81k | £747.70k | £94.88k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.64k | N/A | £4.88k | £9.19k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £605.26k | N/A | £567.81k | £912.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £342 | N/A | £134 | £498 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £18.69k | N/A | £17.81k | £11.63k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £2.00k | £250 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £652.27k | N/A | £579.34k | £964.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.60k | N/A | £11.71k | £5.93k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £6.60k | £7.83k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF HEREFORDSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”) AND, IN PARTICULAR 1) BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. 2) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE INVOLVED WITH THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR IN THE FIELD OF COMMUNITY HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE. 4) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 8 TO 25 RESIDENT OR BORN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY’.
Area of benefit
THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF HEREFORDSHIRE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Broad Street
HEREFORD
HR4 9AB
- Phone:
- 01432343932
- Email:
- will.lindesay@hvoss.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window