IN-DEEP COMMUNITY TASK FORCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A 3 course meal for isolated older people in Victoria. A manicure and pedicure service in Lambeth. A jacket potato lunch for older people providing a good hot meal in Westminster. Free weekly dance class for older people. A Christmas Hamper Scheme and Over 50's choir. A free music therapy service, drama sessions, holiday workshop and trips for families for children and young people with SEND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £13,061 from 5 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Lambeth
Governance
- 30 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN CHAPMAN MBE | Chair | 01 January 2002 |
|
|
||||
Yi Ting Tsai | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Chapman | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Pinkney | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard leafe | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
EMMA CHAPMAN MBE | Trustee | 01 January 2002 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA DE'VANNEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.58k | £44.39k | £72.95k | £89.17k | £107.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.81k | £45.44k | £60.21k | £80.24k | £90.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.25k | £5.76k | £13.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR ELDERLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN LONDON (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR AGE AND THEIR INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ELDERLY PERSONS BY PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 300
95 WILTON ROAD
LONDON
SW1V 1BZ
- Phone:
- 07761263105
- Email:
- emma.chapman@in-deep.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window