HEALTH AID FOR AFRICA (HAFA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity's mission is to build/provide medical centres, schools and water supplies in rural areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ghana
- Sierra Leone
- Tanzania
- Zambia
Governance
- 19 March 2003: Standard registration
- HELP FOR THE NEEDY (Previous name)
- HELPFOR THE NEEDY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ROBERT ATTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GIRISH, DAHYABHAY PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRUCE WILLIAM HARGREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN VICTOR GEORGE CROUCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.02k | £10.26k | £240 | £500 | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.68k | £0 | £470 | £500 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 02 03
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") IN AFRICA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT TO HOSPITALS AND HEALTH CENTRES, THE CONSTRUCTION OF MEDICAL CENTRES AND THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL CARE FOR THE ELDERLY; AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 DOUGLAS ROAD
BENFLEET
SS7 2HN
- Phone:
- 01702555373
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window