THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF ST HUGH'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The College's principal activity is to provide for members of the University of Oxford the protection and training of an Academic House.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£16,663,000
Donations and legacies | £1.98m | |
Charitable activities | £9.42m | |
Other trading activities | £1.54m | |
Investments | £3.71m | |
Other | £20.00k |
Total expenditure:
£13,579,000
Raising funds | £2.79m | |
Charitable activities | £10.79m | |
Other | £0 |
£7,974,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.79m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.79m | |
Retained for future use | £3.08m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.79m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.79m | |
Retained for future use | £11.06m |
People

175 Employee(s)
51 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 06 January 2011: Standard registration
- ST HUGH'S COLLEGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
51 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lady Elish Angiolini | Chair | 13 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Professor David Lucas | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Large | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Steven Portugal | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alexander Mietke | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Martin Booth | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eric Zhao | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Puschel | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julius Grower | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rachel Tanner | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Emma Bond | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Asifa Majid | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Prior | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Damian Jenkins | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Clifford | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Vilain | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bence Kocsis | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alessandro Abate | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Benoit Kornmann | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rama Cont | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Cousins | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Taylor | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eve Morisi | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Erin Saupe | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Harald Oberhauser | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Antoine Jerusalem | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Horst Eidenmuller | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAVID DOYLE | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN PARKIN | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr EDWARD MATTHEW HUSBAND | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr EDWARD MANN | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr TOM SANDERS | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHISTOPHER JOHN BALLENTINE | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Don Grainger | Trustee | 04 October 2000 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIMOTHY ROOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR STEPHEN DUNCAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr LUET WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR PETER MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RAFAEL PERERA-SALAZAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOSHUA GETZLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
Prof Shelagh Vainker | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR PETER MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CLIVE WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JAMES MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ADRIAN MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GEORGE STEPHEN GARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF DAVID MARSHALL FRMETS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ELIZABETH EVA LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NICHOLAS PERKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RUTH BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.66m | £12.78m | £13.56m | £15.56m | £16.66m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.64m | £12.56m | £15.57m | £14.60m | £13.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £474.00k | £459.00k | £38.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £997.00k | £2.86m | £1.26m | £1.36m | £1.98m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £698.00k | £104.00k | £679.00k | £1.42m | £1.54m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.63m | £6.66m | £7.95m | £8.96m | £9.42m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £192.00k | £322.00k | £171.00k | £470.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.85m | £2.59m | £3.58m | £3.83m | £3.71m | |
|
Income - Other | £494.00k | £574.00k | £84.00k | £3.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £85.00k | £686.00k | £82.00k | £603.00k | £477.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.99m | £11.24m | £14.08m | £13.03m | £10.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £654.00k | £773.00k | £655.00k | £1.57m | £2.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.00k | £26.00k | £24.00k | £31.00k | £33.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £38.00k | £275.00k | £89.00k | £259.00k | £265.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £544.00k | £833.00k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £23.97m | £22.99m | £21.91m | £20.90m | £20.02m | |
|
Long-term investments | £93.08m | £106.49m | £101.64m | £97.87m | £105.77m | |
|
Other assets | £6.53m | £7.53m | £7.44m | £9.57m | £10.20m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.44m | -£1.41m | -£2.79m | -£2.55m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £52.77m | £53.11m | £52.80m | £53.27m | £52.41m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER OF 28 JUNE 1926 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL STATUTE DATED 21 DECEMBER 1960 AND STATUTES LAST AMENDED 10 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR MEMBERS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD THE PROTECTION AND TRAINING OF AN ACADEMIC HOUSE, CONDUCTED ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, BUT WITH FULL PROVISION FOR THE LIBERTY OF THOSE WHO ARE NOT MEMBERS. TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO ADVANCING EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH IN OXFORD OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
OXFORD OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. HUGHS COLLEGE
ST. MARGARETS ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6LE
- Phone:
- 01865 274900
- Email:
- bursar@st-hughs.ox.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window