Financial history HUMBERSIDE CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1096072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.40k £12.43k £23.55k £36.62k £11.38k
Total expenditure £16.38k £12.75k £16.33k £42.29k £10.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.83k £22.72k N/A