EAST HENDRED HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village museum and holder of historical information including photographs, documentation and artefacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 December 2002: Standard registration
- CHAMPS CHAPEL MUSEUM HENDRED HERITAGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ROBERTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Carpenter | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Fretter | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hubert Neville Ray | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helene Mary Dinsdale | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Diana Mary Wheeker | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jan Susan Wansell | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN JOHN HINE | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN ROLFE | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BAMBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.44k | £20.16k | £1.06k | £8.07k | £2.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.26k | £4.71k | £5.60k | £5.15k | £5.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND CULTURE OF EAST HENDRED AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR TO ACQUIRE, CONSERVE AND HOUSE HISTORICAL RELICS AND HOUSE HISTORICAL RELICS AND OTHER ITEMS RELATING TO THE PARISH OF EAST HENDRED AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY TO DISPLAY RELICS, ARTEFACTS, BOOKS, TOOLS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND OTHER APPROPRIATE EXHIBITS OF LOCAL INTEREST DEPICTING THE HISTORY OF EAST HENDRED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A HERITAGE TRUST
Area of benefit
EAST HENDRED AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Post Office
High Street
East Hendred
WANTAGE
Oxfordshire
OX128JY
- Phone:
- 01235833279
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window