GRACE HOUSE NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enriching the lives disabled children, young people and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£724,631
Donations and legacies | £121.42k | |
Charitable activities | £515.19k | |
Other trading activities | £54.91k | |
Investments | £17.91k | |
Other | £15.20k |
Total expenditure:
£807,034
Raising funds | £60.06k | |
Charitable activities | £746.98k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £26,161 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £60.06k | |
Charitable expenditure | £746.98k |
People

19 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Sunderland
Governance
- 13 November 2003: Standard registration
- GRACE HOUSE SUNDERLAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Wesley Kris Marriott-Dowding | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pretty | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Mustard | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Norman | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cllr. Kelly Chequer | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Miller | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Neil Henry | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Simon Briton | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £524.92k | £531.89k | £605.96k | £617.22k | £724.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £483.86k | £493.76k | £552.76k | £725.27k | £807.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.16k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £417.74k | £398.61k | £86.80k | £107.29k | £121.42k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £63.73k | £50.37k | £66.57k | £53.09k | £54.91k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £39.67k | £71.50k | £445.07k | £436.65k | £515.19k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.19k | £0 | £2.68k | £15.97k | £17.91k | |
|
Income - Other | £2.59k | £11.41k | £4.85k | £4.21k | £15.20k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £75.00k | £36 | £15.02k | £57.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £439.24k | £460.69k | £505.01k | £669.43k | £746.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £44.63k | £33.07k | £47.75k | £55.84k | £60.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.54k | £0 | £3.47k | £3.47k | £4.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.12m | £3.05m | £2.97m | £2.91m | £2.82m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £102.36k | £108.96k | £215.73k | |
|
Other assets | £386.23k | £500.88k | £520.30k | £494.91k | £400.43k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £33.23k | £40.08k | £33.59k | £61.60k | £66.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31 MAY 2002 AND 30 AUGUST 2006. as amended on 10 May 2022 as amended on 26 Sep 2022 as amended on 26 Sep 2022 as amended on 26 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
2 OBJECTS 2.1 The Charity's objects are restricted specifically to promoting, for the public benefit, the relief of those in need by reason of disability by such charitable means as the trustees shall from time-to-time think fit, in particular in the North of England, and in particular (but without prejudice to the generality whether geographical or otherwise of object) by: 2.1.1 providing care, advice, support and information to disabled young people and providing advice, support, activities and information to the families, friends and carers (including health and social care professionals) of such young people; 2.1.2 providing, encouraging and assisting in the provision and expression of social, emotional, psychological, holistic or other help and guidance in the context of the delivery of support for disabled young people and their families; 2.1.3 promoting and advancing the provision of support for disabled young people and their families, in such ways as the trustees shall from time to time think fit; and 2.1.4 promoting and advancing best practice in the provision of care for disabled young people. 2.2 Nothing in these Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with any statutory provision regarding the meaning of the word "charitable" or the words "charitable purposes" in force in any part of the United Kingdom.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR IN TYNE & WEAR DURHAM NORTHUMBERLAND CUMBRIA AND TEESIDE AND ADJACENT COUNTIES OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grace House
Bardolph Drive
Southwick
SUNDERLAND
Tyne and Wear
SR5 2DE
- Phone:
- 0191 4186920
- Email:
- info@gracehouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window