MELTHAM SPORTS AND COMMUNITY GROUP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was established to provide facilities for the community of Meltham. In 2003 a new purpose build sports and commnuity centre was completed and since that date the trustess have managed the facility on behalf of the Meltham Community. Plans are being developed to extend both the existing centre and also to increase and improve the existing sports pitches in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kirklees
Governance
- 15 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL GRENVILLE WHITE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL JAMES POGSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET ELIZABETH ROCKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ALAN CURTIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE WESTCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID BERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN DANSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES MARTIN STURDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.83k | £89.00k | £133.74k | £125.39k | £112.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.39k | £71.46k | £112.90k | £144.20k | £103.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £61.97k | £18.72k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MELTHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, COMMUNITY FACILITIES ('THE CENTRES') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE COMPANY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
MELTHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 SEFTON LANE
MELTHAM
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 5JX
- Phone:
- 01484308995
- Email:
- p.g.white@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window