STOCKTON SYNTHONIA MALE VOICE CHOIR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
STOCKTON SYNTHONIA MALE VOICE CHOIR PERFORMS REGULARLY AT CARE AND NURSING HOMES AND AT WEDDING, FUNERAL AND COMMEMORATIVE CHURCH SERVICES INCLUDING LOCAL COMMUNITY EVENTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Darlington
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 24 July 2003: Standard registration
- 11 October 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1111222 TEES VALLEY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- SMVC (Working name)
- STOCKTON MALE VOICE CHOIR (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.19k | £2.62k | £3.04k | £390 | £5.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.38k | £2.70k | £3.20k | £357 | £3.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/2007 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS, AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window