THE CASA AZUL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of education of the general public in the state of RIO de Janiero
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Brazil
Governance
- 12 December 2002: Standard registration
- 07 October 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.29k | £17.76k | £6.45k | £6.69k | £3.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.13k | £19.70k | £10.52k | £7.08k | £3.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 15 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 01 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 12 November 2007 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 31 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 24 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 24 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 30 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 30 September 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 3 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS. THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE STATE OF RIO DE JANEIRO BRAZIL AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING : (A) THE INCREASE OF THEIR KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF ANY MATTERS OF HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL, AESTHETIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF ECOLOGY AND CONSERVATION (C) THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF FLORA AND FAUNA. (PLEASE SEE COPY OF THE DEED ON FILE FOR DETAILS).
Area of benefit
BRAZIL - RIO DE JANEIRO
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window