Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF DANTRE (DAVENTRY)

Charity Number: 1094595
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 08 April 2025 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 18 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2021 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required