GLOUCESTERSHIRE DOWN'S SYNDROME SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting families with children with Down's syndrome
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE GORDON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANICE REES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE BURRISS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH MARY DOMMETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY LENNOX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AILEEN ANNETTE JENNINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90 | £72 | £72 | £72 | £67 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME BY THE PROVISION FOR SUCH PEOPLE OF FACILITIES, SERVICES AND OPPORTUNITIES THAT WILL MAXIMISE THEIR PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 THE TULWORTHS
GLOUCESTER
GL2 9RS
- Phone:
- 01452538139
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window