TAMESIDE THIRD SECTOR COALITION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
T3SC is an independent voluntary organisation and the Council for Voluntary Service for Tameside. As the generic infrastructure organisation, T3SC provides a range of practical support for voluntary and community groups, including funding information, bespoke training and development. Through a family of voluntary and community sector networks, we ensure that the voice of the community is heard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Tameside
Governance
- 22 November 2002: Standard registration
- 01 July 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 July 2015: Funds transferred to 1148056 COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY ACTION TAMESIDE
- T3SC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04m | £1.21m | £886.44k | £581.93k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £986.09k | £1.11m | £879.00k | £455.24k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £98.80k | £100.58k | £100.58k | £50.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £139.90k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £941.27k | £1.11m | £780.21k | £385.80k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.34k | £4.60k | £5.65k | £5.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £978.78k | £1.11m | £871.43k | £446.21k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.32k | £6.63k | £7.57k | £9.03k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 05 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 05 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF TAMESIDE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; TO PROMOTE AND ORGANIZE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF TAMESIDE, GREATER MANCHESTER.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window