Financial history THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ASSISTANTS IN SURGICAL PRACTICE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1096498
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 30/06/2009 30/06/2010 30/06/2011
Total gross income £105.76k £108.70k £92.49k £103.75k £20.02k
Total expenditure £117.95k £104.72k £95.71k £107.43k £32.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A