ELMBRIDGE MENCAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a weekly day service provision for adults with learning disabilities and social clubs for adults & children. We also hire out our premises to other learning disability groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PAULA WALSH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fiona Claire Orchard | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Harry Christopher Tomkins | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Sanders | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Inkpen | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lara Suzanne Taylorson | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Joan Louise Pease | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL MALCOLM ANTHONY BLAKE | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARRY JOHN SKINNER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS JEAN RIGDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES ANDREW RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.18k | £53.39k | £126.45k | £91.50k | £152.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.26k | £68.98k | £58.39k | £78.83k | £154.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £700 | N/A | £1.63k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 6 AUGUST 2002. as amended on 27 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE:- 1. THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES DEPENDANTS AND CARERS AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE (PLEASE SEE COPY OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ON FILE FOR DETAILS).
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELMBRIDGE MENCAP
BURVIEW HALL
QUEENS ROAD
HERSHAM
WALTON-ON-THAMES
KT12 5AB
- Phone:
- 01932221304
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window