DWIGHT SCHOOL LONDON FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was dormant for the year to 31st August 2014.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 November 2002: Standard registration
- 27 July 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- DWIGHT SCHOOL LONDON FOUNDATION (Working name)
- WOODSIDE PARK INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 11 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 24 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 24 October 2013 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 29 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE WOODSIDE PARK INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL OR SUCH OTHER PRIMARY OR SECONDARY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT ("THE SCHOOL") BY AWARDING GRANTS AND BURSARIES TO PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MEET THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE COST OF THE SCHOOL'S FEES. (B) AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS PRIZES AND EXHIBITIONS ON GROUNDS OF MERIT TO PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window