THE CROWN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday morning meeting Cell group meeting Prayer Training and Support to Leaders and Members Outreach Building links with Brunel University and local churches Supporting and playing a part in the work of Newfrontiers Supporting other Christian agencies in the relief of the poor and oppressed overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 12 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stefan Omar Brown | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Willetts | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adebimpe Toby | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Wesley | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Durrant | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £601.63k | £423.55k | £418.54k | £360.44k | £397.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £403.07k | £316.93k | £322.60k | £347.05k | £388.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £13.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £596.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £403.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £63.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 9 SEPTEMBER, 2002.
Charitable objects
(A)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS (APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO) IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON AND ITS ENVIRONS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREAFTER CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C)TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (B)TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT;
Area of benefit
HILLINGDON, LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Living Room
High Street
Cowley
UXBRIDGE
UB8 2DZ
- Phone:
- 01895 233466
- Email:
- office@crown-church.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window