Financial history LORDSWOOD LEISURE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1099125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.21m £495.94k £1.10m £1.42m £1.43m
Total expenditure £1.11m £608.00k £1.03m £1.24m £1.34m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £95.61k £13.05k £4.24k
Income - Other trading activities £676.24k N/A £479.08k £854.26k £825.07k
Income - Charitable activities £529.50k N/A £393.62k £537.33k £584.35k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £624 N/A £38 £3.52k £11.81k
Income - Other £0 N/A £133.83k £9.80k £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £428.70k N/A £442.72k £462.04k £557.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £685.00k N/A £0 £773.16k £782.81k
Expenditure - Governance £8.49k N/A £8.97k £12.07k £14.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £587.92k £0 £0