THE FLINTSHIRE U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational, recreational and social activities for people no longer in full-time employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Flintshire
Governance
- 18 February 2003: Standard registration
- FLINTSHIRE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Working name)
- FU3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Jane Wynne-Eyton | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joan Christina Maw | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Andrew Nicoll | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Paul Whiteaker | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Thomas | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Feather | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mather | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Green | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jude Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jon Payne | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Julia Ingman | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.31k | £11.99k | £13.07k | £21.95k | £37.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.72k | £12.10k | £8.82k | £23.04k | £36.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 DECEMBER 2001, AS AMENDED 10 FEBRUARY 2010 AND 9 FEBRUARY 2011. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 30 Sep 2021 as amended on 24 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
FLINTSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Church Lane
MOLD
Clwyd
CH7 1BW
- Phone:
- 01352 840125
- Website:
-
flintshire-u3a.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window