Trustees BASINGSTOKE AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1103166

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ryan Stevens Chair 03 September 2020
None on record
Ian May-Miller Trustee 12 September 2024
VIABLES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Catherine Rose Hannan Trustee 12 September 2024
None on record
Sharon Lisa Cornwell Trustee 12 September 2024
None on record
Owen Thomas Chapple White Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Natasha Jane Jenkins Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Richard Howard Cox Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Andrew Stuart James Wood Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Rachel Suzzanne Kingston De Caires Trustee 14 October 2015
None on record