ROTHERHAM ORGANISATION FOR DOWN'S SYNDROME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for people with or affected by Downs Syndrome, including the provision of advice, social activities and education in Rotherham and the surrounding region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 29 October 2002: Standard registration
- RODS (Working name)
- ROTHERHAM ORGANISATIONS FOR DOWN'S SYNDROME (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Langford | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Suzanne Thompson | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tsui Kem Tang | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sara Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HACON | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA BROOKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN BROOKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.97k | £27 | £1.77k | £1.96k | £2.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.02k | £466 | £651 | £1.81k | £1.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME BY THE PROVISION FOR SUCH PEOPLE OF FACILITIES, SERVICES AND OPPORTUNITIES THAT WILL MAXIMISE THEIR PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
ROTHERHAM, SOUTH YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 BLACKMOOR CRESCENT
BRINSWORTH
ROTHERHAM
S60 5AS
- Phone:
- 07535617523
- Website:
-
rods-Rotherham.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window