FORPS FRIENDS OF ROADE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1094189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christmas and Summer Fayres Quiz Nights Treasure Hunt Harvest Festival Halloween/Valentines Discos Refreshments at school activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £9,306
Total expenditure: £6,417

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FORPS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hillary Poole Trustee 10 September 2019
None on record
CLAIRE CUMBERLAND Trustee 15 March 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.22k £1.73k £7.65k £13.05k £9.31k
Total expenditure £8.30k £6.15k £3.67k £6.94k £6.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 April 2025 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 September 2021 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 October 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROADE PRIMARY SCHOOL
HARTWELL ROAD
ROADE
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 2NT
Phone:
01604 862309
Website:

No information available