THE BORDER HOLIDAY GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General fundraising the purpose of which is to take persons with physical & mild learning difficulties on a foreign holiday on a bi-annual basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 September 2003: Standard registration
- 18 December 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.57k | £14.79k | £23.57k | £13.08k | £15.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.33k | £15.19k | £10.80k | £24.24k | £3.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 07 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 05 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 11 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 11 August 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY PROVIDING FOR HOLIDAYS FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITY WHO ARE SICK OR INFIRM WHO RESIDE IN THE BORDERS REGION OF SOUTHERN SCOTLAND
Area of benefit
BORDERS REGION OF SOUTHERN SCOTLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window