Governance LONDON INTERNATIONAL MODEL UNITED NATIONS
Charity number: 1096197
Removed charity
Registration history:
- 24 February 2003: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 December 2009: Standard registration
- 09 December 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 December 2011: Re-registered
- 01 March 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1159324 LONDON INTERNATIONAL MODEL UNITED NATIONS FOUNDATI...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- LIMUN (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.