LOCAL CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY (VAUXHALL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As per Constitution (Governing Document)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
Governance
- 24 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERENCE LEE EDWARDS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
HORETIUS MORRY OKANGA | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAWSON WILLIAM BOYD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.86k | £306.25k | £328.19k | £334.81k | £372.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.20k | £166.13k | £153.68k | £201.59k | £249.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 09 JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED ON 09 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH OUR STATEMENT OF BELIEFS SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS CONSTITUTION) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 Cleave Road
Gillingham
Kent
ME7 4AT
- Phone:
- 07702467831
- Email:
- terenceedwards@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window