Financial history DORSET PROVINCIAL CHAPTER CHARITY

Charity number: 1095600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.03k £1.44k £2.16k £3.21k £3.21k
Total expenditure £3.86k £2.45k £5.27k £3.63k £3.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A