CHINESE HEALTH INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of health services, health information and support, health promotion and interpreting service; drop in service, Chinese GP drop in surgery, health activities for older people, foot screening service,telephone information and help service, drop in service and health checks. General information and support service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,404 from 3 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 07 October 2002: Standard registration
- CHIC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Shulan Tang | Chair | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chung Tai Chiu | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mark Benjamin Gabbay | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wai Ling Wong | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mei Yin Stott | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHI KIN HO | Trustee | 04 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIMON SIU MAN KAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR WARREN YEUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR PAUL YU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN SHIEU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.37k | £80.50k | £98.04k | £122.52k | £178.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.89k | £98.88k | £100.92k | £127.53k | £177.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £22.89k | N/A | £16.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE BENEFITS FOR THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER MANCHESTER, IN PARTICULAR THE CHINESE AND SOUTH EAST ASIAN RESIDENTS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, AND THE LOCAL INHABITANTS IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT SERVICE. B) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY PROMOTING HEALTH EDUCATION. C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY SERVICES, IN ORDER TO GAIN ACCESS TO EDUCATIONAL, ECONOMIC, HEALTH, HOUSING, LEISURE, SOCIAL WELFARE AND OTHER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Houldsworth Street
Manchester
M1 1EJ
- Phone:
- 01612280138
- Email:
- chic.manchester@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window