THE VICTORIA CLIMBIE FOUNDATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The foundation is committed to raising awareness of child protection, and working to eradicate child maltreatment, exploitation and trafficking. In order to influence improvement of good practice in child protection policies and procedures, we are committed to a pluralist where childrenÔÇÖs human rights are prioritised and paramount where nobody is allowed to use religion or culture to harm them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 July 2003: Standard registration
- 08 July 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE FAMILY FOUNDATION GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2004 | 01/09/2006 | 01/09/2007 | 01/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £1.35k | £10.02k | £54.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.78k | £4.10k | £4.88k | £51.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2008 | 02 July 2009 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2008 | 02 July 2009 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 01 September 2007 | 08 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2007 | 08 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2006 | 11 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2005 | 09 May 2007 | 312 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 22 JUNE 2003 AND 11 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE FROM THE BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES, A) TO PROMOTE THEIR HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET OUT IN THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THEIR GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND SAFEGUARD AND PROTECT THEM FROM ABUSE AND ALL OTHER INJURIOUS HUMILIATING AND DEGRADING TREATMENTS, IN PARTICULAR BY ACTING AS ADVOCATES WITH REGARD TO LIASING WITH AUTHORITIES SUCH AS SOCIAL SERVICES AND OTHER CHILD PROTECTION AGENCIES AND BY PROVIDING AND SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN CHILD PROTECTION AND FAMILY SUPPORT ISSUES AND THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING SERVICES. 2. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ABOUT ALL ISSUES RELATING TO THE SAFEGUARDING AND PROTECTION OF CHILDREN AND THEIR HUMAN RIGHTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON, SOUTHALL AND STONEBRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window