READING GATEWAY CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reading Gateway Church transferred its church activities to King's Church International in 2007. Following this the charity used its assets (predominantly its property: Hilltop Christian Centre) to facilitate the activities of other charities. Hilltop Christian Centre has now been sold and it has been decided to distribute the charity's remaining funds to King's Church International.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
Governance
- 20 February 2003: Standard registration
- 08 April 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.53k | £83.35k | £66.67k | £394.81k | £2.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.49k | £97.28k | £76.32k | £21.31k | £739.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 17 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | 17 March 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 20 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | 20 August 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 14 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | 14 August 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 27 September 2007 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 27 September 2007 | 27 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 30 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 14 August 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY IN BERKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE, BY ANY MEANS OR MEDIUM THAT IS OR MAY BE BECOME AVAILABLE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINE SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF SICKNESS OR AGE OR SOME OTHER REASON 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BOTH GENERAL AND VOCATIONAL FOR CHILDREN OR ADULTS BUT ALWAYS WITHIN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window