SEFTON ADVOCACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides advocacy and information services to vulnerable residents of Sefton. Its objects are to relieve these vulnerable residents from social exclusion empowering them to make informed decisions and choices about their lives to achieve change. The charity promotes confidence to speak out and where this is not possible will represent and speak on behalf of the service user.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 28 November 2002: Standard registration
- 22 February 2020: Funds received from 1055951 SEFTON PENSIONERS ADVOCACY CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Susan Bell | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jones | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lionel Johnson | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Robins | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN PARKER | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £355.89k | £379.15k | £374.21k | £373.62k | £373.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £388.58k | £403.53k | £372.08k | £337.97k | £337.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £351.73k | £377.32k | £372.24k | £373.01k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES OR PHYSICAL, SENSORY OR OTHER IMPAIRMENT, MENTAL ILL HEALTH OR WHO ARE VULNERABLE DUE TO SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND WHO ARE LIVING OR HAVE FAMILY TIES IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SEFTON (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE BENEFICIARIES) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT IN ORDER TO GAIN ACCESS TO EDUCATIONAL, ECONOMIC, HEALTH, HOUSING , LEISURE, SOCIAL WELFARE AND OTHER SERVICES ON THE SAME BASIS AS OTHERS WITHOUT SUCH DISADVANTAGES THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF ADVOCACY IN ALL ITS FORMS.
Area of benefit
SEFTON MBC, MERSEYSIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Hoghton Street
Southport
Merseyside
PR9 0NS
- Phone:
- 01704500500
- Email:
- info@seftonadvocacy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window