CHURCHES VISITOR AND TOURISM ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote among churches and others the need to promote churches open to visitors and tourists, and to educate churches and others as to the benefits to individuals and communities that can arise from such a welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 December 2003: Standard registration
- CHURCHES TOURISM ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Clive David Deverell | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew Betts | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Catling | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
EMMA CRITCHLEY | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD TULLOCH | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN BEAL | Trustee | 11 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Sarah Crossland | Trustee | 11 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MS BECKY PAYNE | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|||||
REVEREND CANON JOHN BROWN | Trustee | 12 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE MARGRET HIBBARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.59k | £1.88k | £1.60k | £1.64k | £1.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.16k | £473 | £504 | £929 | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF CHURCHES IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY GAIN A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE FAITH THE BUILDINGS EXPRESS AND THUS PROMOTE RELIGIOUS FAITH AND BELIEF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
556 GALLEYWOOD ROAD
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8BX
- Phone:
- 01245358185
- Email:
- canonjbrown@mac.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window