Financial history MARDEN LODGE EARLY EDUCATION AND CHILDCARE CENTRE

Charity Number: 1097102
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012
Total gross income £100 £0 £0 £205 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £308
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A